SD HB1032 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the authority of the Board of Education Standards to promulgate rules regarding certification.
Title
Revise the authority of the Board of Education Standards to promulgate rules regarding certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 418 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2020 H.J. 347 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 297 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 323 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 243 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 233 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 204 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 142 |
2020-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 17. H.J. 119 |
2020-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 86 |
2020-01-27 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 65 |
2020-01-24 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 2. |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 27 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |