SD HB1032 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding money transmission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding money transmission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 13, 2019 H.J. 760
2019-03-07SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 H.J. 674
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the President S.J. 637
2019-03-05SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 647
2019-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 596
2019-02-28SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-28SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 547
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 157
2019-01-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 148
2019-01-17HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 141
2019-01-16HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-16HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 128
2019-01-16HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 23

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback