SD HB1032 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - Signed by Governor H.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - Signed by Governor H.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the reporting period for the collection of the use tax.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the reporting period for the collection of the use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Signed by Governor H.J. 458 | |
2010-02-17 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 455 | |
2010-02-16 | Signed by President S.J. 342 | |
2010-02-12 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 387 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 307 | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-10 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 272 | |
2010-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 152 | |
2010-01-26 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 176 | |
2010-01-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 170 | |
2010-01-22 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 163 | |
2010-01-21 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-01-21 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 142 | |
2010-01-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 24 |