SD HB1031 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 H.J. 304
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize certain wind and solar easements and leases by the commissioner of School and Public Lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize certain wind and solar easements and leases by the commissioner of School and Public Lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06SenateSigned by the Governor on February 5, 2019 H.J. 304
2019-01-31SenateDelivered to the Governor on January 31, 2019 H.J. 276
2019-01-30SenateSigned by the President S.J. 220
2019-01-29SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 241
2019-01-28SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 5. H.J. 217
2019-01-24SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 172
2019-01-22SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 136
2019-01-22SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1031wa
2019-01-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-16SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 107
2019-01-15HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 11. H.J. 71
2019-01-14HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 44
2019-01-14HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 22

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1031&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1031P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1031SCO.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1031ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27138&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27197&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27337&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27436&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27532&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback