SD HB1031 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2016 H.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2016 H.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions pertaining to weights and measures.
Title
Revise certain provisions pertaining to weights and measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2016 H.J. 458 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 17, 2016 H.J. 427 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 311 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 386 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 286 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 259 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 196 |
2016-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 242 |
2016-01-27 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 192 |
2016-01-27 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1031fc |
2016-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 36 |
2016-01-12 | House | First Reading House H.J. 21 |