SD HB1030 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 H.J. 288
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allow the Office of School and Public Lands to accept internet bidding for the leasing of state minerals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow the Office of School and Public Lands to accept internet bidding for the leasing of state minerals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05SenateSigned by the Governor on January 31, 2019 H.J. 288
2019-01-28SenateDelivered to the Governor on January 28, 2019 H.J. 216
2019-01-25SenateSigned by the President S.J. 194
2019-01-24SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 175
2019-01-23SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 158
2019-01-22SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-22SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 135
2019-01-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-16SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 107
2019-01-15HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 70
2019-01-14HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 44
2019-01-14HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 22

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback