SD HB1029 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding criminal background checks for adults working in child care institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding criminal background checks for adults working in child care institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-20SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 454
2019-02-19SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 408
2019-02-14SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 381
2019-02-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 233
2019-01-29HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 235
2019-01-25HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-25HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 183
2019-01-25HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1029ca
2019-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 22

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback