SD HB1028 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 15, 2022 H.J. 290
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 15, 2022 H.J. 290
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update certain provisions related to the licensure of optometrists.
Title
Update certain provisions related to the licensure of optometrists.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 15, 2022 H.J. 290 |
2022-02-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 09, 2022 H.J. 242 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 214 |
2022-02-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 227 |
2022-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 194 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 152 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1028D |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 104 |
2022-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 105 |
2022-01-20 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed H.J. 1 |
2022-01-20 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-01-20 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 Amendment 1028A |
2022-01-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 21 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Appointments
Boards and Commissions
Executive/Judiciary Request
Health Care
Licensure
Promulgation of Rules
Appointments
Boards and Commissions
Executive/Judiciary Request
Health Care
Licensure
Promulgation of Rules