SD HB1027 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding vote centers and precinct workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding vote centers and precinct workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSigned by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
2019-02-14SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 403
2019-02-13SenateSigned by the President S.J. 373
2019-02-12SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 382
2019-02-11SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 332
2019-02-08SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-08SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 310
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 233
2019-01-29HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 20. H.J. 237
2019-01-28HouseRemove from Consent Calendar H.J. 221
2019-01-24HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-24HouseLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 167
2019-01-24HouseLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1027cd
2019-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-17HouseLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1027cb
2019-01-17HouseLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1027ca
2019-01-17HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 22

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback