SD HB1026 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2019 H.J. 336
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding petitions, notices, and statements of convention nominees and certifications of party officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding petitions, notices, and statements of convention nominees and certifications of party officials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08SenateSigned by the Governor on February 8, 2019 H.J. 336
2019-02-05SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 05, 2019 H.J. 288
2019-01-31SenateSigned by the President S.J. 256
2019-01-30SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 273
2019-01-29SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 1. S.J. 218
2019-01-28SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 196
2019-01-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 168
2019-01-23HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 161
2019-01-17HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-17HouseLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 138
2019-01-17HouseLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1026ca
2019-01-17HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 21

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback