SD HB1025 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2022 H.J. 443
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2022 H.J. 443
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update legal holidays in South Dakota.
Title
Update legal holidays in South Dakota.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2022 H.J. 443 |
2022-02-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 08, 2022 H.J. 230 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 200 |
2022-02-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 216 |
2022-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 21. H.J. 194 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 11. S.J. 154 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Amend the amendment, Passed S.J. 154 Amendment 1025B |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 153 Amendment 1025A |
2022-01-31 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 105 |
2022-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 25. H.J. 109 |
2022-01-21 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 1 |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 22 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |