SD HB1025 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Signed by the Governor on February 16, 2021 H.J. 293
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Delete or revise certain outdated language relating to education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delete or revise certain outdated language relating to education.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Education: Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseSigned by the Governor on February 16, 2021 H.J. 293
2021-02-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 10, 2021 H.J. 270
2021-02-09SenateSigned by the President S.J. 229
2021-02-08HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 247
2021-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 201
2021-02-04SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1
2021-02-04SenateEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-02SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-27SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 124
2021-01-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 130
2021-01-25HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-01-25HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
2021-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 16

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback