SD HB1025 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2020 H.J. 537
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2020 H.J. 537
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding plugging and performance bonds for oil and gas wells.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding plugging and performance bonds for oil and gas wells.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2020 H.J. 537 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2020 H.J. 480 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 421 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 458 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 387 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 366 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 360 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Deferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed S.J. 327 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 306 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 157 |
2020-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 5. H.J. 182 |
2020-02-04 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. |
2020-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 19 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |