SD HB1024 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize certain species of game fish to be used as bait.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize certain species of game fish to be used as bait.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSigned by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
2019-02-13SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 386
2019-02-12SenateSigned by the President S.J. 358
2019-02-11SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 363
2019-02-08SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 341
2019-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 281
2019-01-31SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-31SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 243
2019-01-31SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1024ba
2019-01-31SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 157
2019-01-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 150
2019-01-17HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 141
2019-01-16HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 132
2019-01-15HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 66
2019-01-15HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 21

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1024&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1024P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1024SAG.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1024ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27170&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27347&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27723&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27853&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28033&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback