SD HB1023 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the sale and purchase of big game animal parts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the sale and purchase of big game animal parts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSigned by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
2019-02-08SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 08, 2019 H.J. 336
2019-02-07SenateSigned by the President S.J. 305
2019-02-06SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 311
2019-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 265
2019-01-31SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-31SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 242
2019-01-31SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 157
2019-01-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 149
2019-01-17HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 141
2019-01-16HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 132
2019-01-15HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 66
2019-01-15HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 21

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback