SD HB1022 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2020 H.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2020 H.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding dealer licenses for motor vehicle, snowmobile, and boat sales.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding dealer licenses for motor vehicle, snowmobile, and boat sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2020 H.J. 326 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 13, 2020 H.J. 283 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 216 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 263 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 175 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 99 |
2020-01-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 66 |
2020-01-23 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-23 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1022A |
2020-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to House Transportation H.J. 19 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |