SD HB1022 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the limitations on indemnification by the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the limitations on indemnification by the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 675
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-06SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 661
2019-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 600
2019-02-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556
2019-02-26SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 518
2019-02-26SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1022wa
2019-02-26SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 279
2019-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 293
2019-01-30HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-30HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 247
2019-01-30HouseCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1022yb
2019-01-30HouseCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1022ya
2019-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 21

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1022&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1022P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1022HCO.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1022SCO.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1022ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27662&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27785&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28873&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29118&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29267&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback