SD HB1021 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding bid bonds for public improvement contracts.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding bid bonds for public improvement contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 527 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 544 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 478 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 446 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 190 |
2019-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 172 |
2019-01-23 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-23 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 156 |
2019-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 20 |