SD HB1020 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 656
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 656
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Bureau of Administration to construct an addition to the Kinsman Building in Pierre, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the Bureau of Administration to construct an addition to the Kinsman Building in Pierre, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 656 |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2022 H.J. 594 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 457 |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 536 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 407 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 398 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Senate, Passed S.J. 379 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 305 |
2022-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 8. H.J. 379 |
2022-02-16 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. J.J. 1 |
2022-02-16 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 40 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |