SD HB1020 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to continue the veteran's bonus program and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to continue the veteran's bonus program and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs: Recommend Referral to (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 502
2021-03-03SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 401
2021-03-02SenateCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2021-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 350
2021-02-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 13. H.J. 390
2021-02-23HouseCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-08HouseCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3.
2021-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-26HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Recommend Referral to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
2021-01-26HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-15HouseReferred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 34
2021-01-12HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 10

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback