SD HB1020 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 17. S.J. 642
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 17. S.J. 642
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the mailing fees for noncommercial vehicle plates and decals.
Title
Revise the mailing fees for noncommercial vehicle plates and decals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 17. S.J. 642 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 627 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 612 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 579 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 193 |
2015-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 166 |
2015-01-22 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 79 |
2015-01-22 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1020ob |
2015-01-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Transportation H.J. 38 |
2015-01-13 | House | First read in House H.J. 26 |