SD HB1020 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Department of Game, Fish and Parks to sell the Marcotte Tract located within the Marcotte Game Production Area in Meade County to the City of Sturgis.
Title
Authorize the Department of Game, Fish and Parks to sell the Marcotte Tract located within the Marcotte Game Production Area in Meade County to the City of Sturgis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Signed by Governor H.J. 594 | |
2012-02-22 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 513 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 450 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 385 | |
2012-02-10 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 365 | |
2012-02-09 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 331 | |
2012-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 195 | |
2012-01-25 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 205 | |
2012-01-24 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 189 | |
2012-01-20 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-20 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 62 | |
2012-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 19 |