SD HB1015 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 780
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 780
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions regarding the South Dakota Risk Pool.
Title
Repeal certain provisions regarding the South Dakota Risk Pool.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 780 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 765 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 666 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 713 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 3. S.J. 639 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 619 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 237 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate S.J. 105 |
2015-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 86 |
2015-01-20 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-01-20 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 54 |
2015-01-20 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1015fa |
2015-01-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 38 |
2015-01-13 | House | First read in House H.J. 25 |