SD HB1015 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 825
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 825
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the construction of an addition, remodeling, and renovation of Medary Commons on the campus of South Dakota State University and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the construction of an addition, remodeling, and renovation of Medary Commons on the campus of South Dakota State University and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 825 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 735 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 583 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 551 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 326 |
2013-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 10. H.J. 289 |
2013-01-31 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 268 |
2013-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 23 |