SD HB1014 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2021 H.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish uniform complaint and declaratory ruling procedures for agencies regulating certain professions and occupations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish uniform complaint and declaratory ruling procedures for agencies regulating certain professions and occupations.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseSigned by the Governor on February 22, 2021 H.J. 326
2021-02-17HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 17, 2021 H.J. 303
2021-02-16SenateSigned by the President S.J. 271
2021-02-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 288
2021-02-10SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 241
2021-02-09SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 5
2021-02-09SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 102
2021-01-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 111
2021-01-22HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 111 Amendment 1014C
2021-01-20HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2021-01-20HouseCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1014A
2021-01-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 11

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback