SD HB1011 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions relating to the South Dakota Retirement System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions relating to the South Dakota Retirement System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSigned by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
2019-02-12SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 H.J. 366
2019-02-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 336
2019-02-08SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 346
2019-02-07SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 304
2019-02-05SenateRetirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 275
2019-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 233
2019-01-29HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 237
2019-01-24HouseRetirement Laws Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 178
2019-01-24HouseRetirement Laws Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1011jb
2019-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 18

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback