SD HB1011 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the South Dakota Retirement System.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the South Dakota Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 H.J. 366 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 336 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 346 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 304 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 275 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 233 |
2019-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 237 |
2019-01-24 | House | Retirement Laws Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 178 |
2019-01-24 | House | Retirement Laws Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1011jb |
2019-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 18 |