SD HB1010 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recodify, to make certain form and style changes, to clarify, and to repeal certain provisions related to the South Dakota Retirement System.
Title
Recodify, to make certain form and style changes, to clarify, and to repeal certain provisions related to the South Dakota Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 H.J. 366 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 336 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 346 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 303 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 275 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 214 |
2019-01-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 223 |
2019-01-24 | House | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2019-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 18 |