SD HB1009 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding state employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding state employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694
2019-03-05SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019 H.J. 626
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the President S.J. 600
2019-02-28SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 593
2019-02-27SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 542
2019-02-26SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 517
2019-02-26SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-17SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 122
2019-01-16HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 131
2019-01-15HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 69
2019-01-14HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 44
2019-01-14HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 18

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback