SD HB1006 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2023 H.J. 518
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increase the funding for construction of an addition to the Kinsman Building in Pierre, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase the funding for construction of an addition to the Kinsman Building in Pierre, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-02-27 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-09HouseSigned by the Governor on March 09, 2023 H.J. 518
2023-03-02HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 02, 2023 H.J. 450
2023-03-01SenateSigned by the President S.J. 397
2023-02-28HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 416
2023-02-27SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 355
2023-02-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 338
2023-02-23HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 10. H.J. 362
2023-02-21JointCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0.
2023-02-21JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2023-02-13JointScheduled for hearing
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 24
2023-01-10HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 14

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback