SD HB1002 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 H.J. 288
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for criminal background checks for certain applicants and employees of the Department of Public Safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for criminal background checks for certain applicants and employees of the Department of Public Safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Placed on consent (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05SenateSigned by the Governor on January 31, 2019 H.J. 288
2019-01-29SenateDelivered to the Governor on January 29, 2019 H.J. 230
2019-01-28SenateSigned by the President S.J. 203
2019-01-25SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 212
2019-01-24SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 173
2019-01-23SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 158
2019-01-22SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 134
2019-01-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-16SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 106
2019-01-15HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 69
2019-01-14HousePlaced on consent, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2019-01-14HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 44
2019-01-14HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 17

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback