SD HB1002 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 589
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 589
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to the Department of Revenue to provide for the electronic submission of reports and taxes related to alcoholic beverages and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to the Department of Revenue to provide for the electronic submission of reports and taxes related to alcoholic beverages and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Solum [R] | Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] |
Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Tabled (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 589 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 544 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 303 |
2015-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 9. H.J. 296 |
2015-01-30 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 240 |
2015-01-30 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1002na |
2015-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Appropriations H.J. 37 |
2015-01-13 | House | First read in House H.J. 22 |