SC S915 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Act No. 248
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Act No. 248
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND ACT 314 OF 2000, RELATING TO THE SOUTH CAROLINA COMMUNITY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT ACT AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TAX CREDITS, SO AS TO TERMINATE THE PROVISIONS OF THE SOUTH CAROLINA COMMUNITY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT ACT AND TAX CREDITS ON JUNE 30, 2015. - ratified title
Title
Terminate The Provisions Of The South Carolina Community Economic Development Act And Tax Credits On June 30, 2015. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Anderson [D] | Sen. Dick Elliott [D] | Sen. John Land [D] | Sen. Phil Leventis [D] |
Sen. Floyd Nicholson [D] | Sen. Nikki Setzler [D] | Sen. Vincent Sheheen [D] | Sen. Kent Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Act No. 248 | |
2010-07-01 | Effective date 06/14/10 | |
2010-06-14 | Became law without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-07 | Ratified R 304 | |
2010-06-01 | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 HJ-89 | |
2010-06-01 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-89 | |
2010-05-26 | Returned to House with amendments SJ-106 | |
2010-05-26 | House amendment amended SJ-106 | |
2010-05-20 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-13 | |
2010-05-19 | Read second time HJ-15 | |
2010-05-19 | Amended HJ-15 | |
2010-05-18 | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, May 19, 2010 HJ-53 | |
2010-05-12 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, May 18, 2010 HJ-105 | |
2010-05-05 | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means HJ-29 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-13 | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced and read first time HJ-12 | |
2010-02-23 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-16 | |
2010-02-18 | Read second time SJ-6 | |
2010-02-17 | Committee report: Favorable Finance SJ-13 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-16 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced and read first time SJ-16 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2009-12-09 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3312 (Similar To) 2009-01-27 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-11
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=915&session=118 |