SC S403 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence HJ-46
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence HJ-46
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO REQUEST THAT THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION NAME THE INTERCHANGE AT ASHBY ROAD AND MCIVER ROAD IN THE TOWN OF QUINBY AS "T. ASHBY GREGG, SR. INTERCHANGE" AND ERECT APPROPRIATE MARKERS OR SIGNS AT THIS INTERCHANGE THAT CONTAIN THE WORDS "T. ASHBY GREGG, SR. INTERCHANGE".
Title
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Interchange At Ashby Road And Mciver Road In The Town Of Quinby As "t. Ashby Gregg, Sr. Interchange" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Interchange That Contain The Words "t. Ashby Gregg, Sr. Interchange".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence HJ-46 | |
2010-02-17 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-204 | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-50 | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced HJ-50 | |
2010-01-28 | Adopted, sent to House SJ-25 | |
2010-01-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-01-27 | Committee report: Favorable Transportation SJ-12 | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-18 | |
2009-02-11 | Introduced SJ-18 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=403&session=118 |