SC S1299 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-25 - Act No. 264
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-25 - Act No. 264
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 164 Of 2003, As Amended, Relating To The Nine Defined Single-member Election Districts From Which The Members Of The Union County Board Of School Trustees Are Elected, So As To Reapportion These Single-member Election Districts, To Update The Map Number On Which These Single-member Election Districts Are Delineated, And To Provide Demographic Information Pertaining To The Reapportioned Election Districts; And To Amend Act 105 Of 2021, As Amended, Relating To The Consolidation Of Barnwell County (blackville) School District No. 19 And Barnwell County (williston) School District No. 29 Into One School District To Be Known As The Barnwell County Consolidated School District, So As To Establish And Reapportion The Seven Single-member Election Districts From Which The Members Of The Barnwell County Consolidated School District Board Of Trustees Must Be Elected Beginning With The 2022 School District Elections, To Designate A Map Number On Which These Election Districts Are Delineated, And To Provide Demographic Information Pertaining To These Election Districts. - Ratified Title
Title
Union County School District Reapportionment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-25 | Act No. 264 | |
2022-07-13 | Effective date 07/05/22 | |
2022-07-05 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Ratified R 272 | |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2022-06-28 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-06-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2022-06-15 | House | Read second time |
2022-06-15 | House | Amended |
2022-05-12 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Union Delegation |
2022-05-04 | House | Referred to Union Delegation |
2022-05-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Unanimous consent for second and third readings on next two consecutive legislative days |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |