SC S1280 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The North Tyger River Bridge On Hwy 296, Also Known As Reidville Road, Between Shenandoah Drive And Nichols Drive In Spartanburg County "keegan Isaiah Johnson Bridge" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing This Designation.
Title
Keegan Isaiah
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2022-05-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-04-21 | House | Introduced |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, sent to House |