SC S1257 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Located At The Junction Of George Rogers Boulevard And Andrews Road In Richland County "joseph Lee Jackson Memorial Intersection" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Intersection Containing These Words.
Title
Joseph Lee Jackson Memorial Intersection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-05-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-05-04 | House | Introduced |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Introduced |