SC S1212 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-14 - Read third time and sent to House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Suspend Any Requirement That A School Board Candidate Must Collect Petition Signatures To Run For A School Board Seat Until December 31, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School board candidates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-14SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-05-13SenateRead second time
2020-05-12SenateUnanimous consent for second and third readings on next two consecutive legislative days
2020-05-12SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback