SC S1137 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution To Commend The Rotary Club Of Little River For Its Exemplary Efforts To Educate Children And Their Parents About Water Safety, To Encourage All Citizens Of This Great State To Become Better Informed About Prevention Of Child Drownings And The Practice Of Water Safety, And To Declare Saturday, April 2, 2022, As "josh The Otter Water Safety Day" In South Carolina.
Title
Josh the Otter Water Safety Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Introduced |