SC S1134 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Referred to Darlington Delegation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Act 259 Of 1961, As Amended, Relating To The Hartsville Community Center Building Commission, So As To Increase The Commission's Membership From Three To Five Members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hartsville Community Center Building Commission; Act No. 259

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24HouseReferred to Darlington Delegation
2020-06-24HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-05-12SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-03-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback