SC S1060 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Increase The Membership To Include The President Of The South Carolina Fraternal Order Of Police, Or His Designee.
Title
SLED Hall of Fame Advisory Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4507 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Act No. 136