SC S1055 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Of Gibson Road Where Highway 378 Splits Toward Lake Murray In Lexington County "h.e. 'bucky' Phillips, Jr. Intersection" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing This Designation.
Title
H E "Bucky" Phillips, Jr. Intersection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-04-05 | House | Introduced |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2022-03-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced |