SC S1047 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Referred to Orangeburg Delegation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Referred to Orangeburg Delegation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Orangeburg County School District Must Be Governed By A Nine Member Board Of Trustees Elected From Single-member Districts, And To Provide Demographic Information Regarding The Election Districts.
Title
Orangeburg County School District Consolidation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Referred to Orangeburg Delegation |
2018-05-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-04-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |