SC S1042 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 206
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 206
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Define The Term "international Major Medical Insurance" And To Include This Form Of Insurance In The Definition For The Term "surplus Lines Insurance"
Title
Insurance, definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 206 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date 05/15/18 | |
2018-05-15 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 224 | |
2018-05-03 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2018-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4987 (Similar To) 2018-02-21 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry