SC S1033 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Requests for debate-Rep
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To Family Preservation And Reunification, To Allow The Department Of Social Services To Forego Reasonable Efforts To Reunify A Family In The Case Of Torture; To Amend Section 63-7-2570, Relating To Grounds For Termination Of Parental Rights, To Add Torture, Or Conspiring To Commit Torture, As A Ground For Terminating A Parent's Rights; To Amend Section 16-3-85, Relating To Homicide By Child Abuse, To Add Death Of A Child By Torture, Or By Conspiring To Torture, As Actions Constituting The Offense, And To Establish Criminal Penalties; To Amend Article 1, Chapter 3, Title 16 Of The 1976, Relating To Homicide, By Adding Section 16-3-100 To Provide That Torturing A Child, Or Allowing Another To Torture A Child, Is A Criminal Offense, And To Establish Penalties; And To Define Necessary Terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Torture of a child

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2018-05-03HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2018-04-03HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-03HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-03-29SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2018-03-29SenateRead third time and sent to House
2018-03-29 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-28SenateRead second time
2018-03-28SenateAmended
2018-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment Tabled
2018-03-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-22SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment General
2018-02-21SenateReferred to Committee on General
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H4854 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
163100(n/a)See Bill Text
16385(n/a)See Bill Text
6371640(n/a)See Bill Text
6372570(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback