SC S1026 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 56-3-190 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Registration And Licensure Of Vehicles By The Department Of Motor Vehicles, To Provide That If A Commercial Motor Vehicle Is Registered Through The International Registration Plan And Is Operated Under A United States Department Of Transportation (usdot) Number Assigned To A Person Other Than The Vehicle's Owner, Then The Person To Whom The Usdot Number Is Assigned May Register The Commercial Motor Vehicle By Submitting The Appropriate Application And Fees To The Department Of Motor Vehicles.
Title
Vehicle licensure and registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |