SC S1012 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of United States Highway 78 In Orangeburg County From Its Intersection With United States Highway 21 In The Town Of Branchville To The Orangeburg/dorchester County Line "betty Henderson Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing This Designation.
Title
Betty Henderson Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2022-01-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced |