SC S1010 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to Aiken Delegation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to Aiken Delegation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 2 Of Act 926 Of 1962, Relating To The Membership Of The Aiken County Commission For Technical Education, To Add Two Non-voting Members.
Title
Aiken County Commission for Technical Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Aiken Delegation |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |