SC S0992 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 44-37-30(b) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Information Obtained From Neonatal Testing Of Children, To Provide That, At The Same Time Information Is Released To A Child's Physician, The Department Shall Refer Children With Metabolic, Genetic, Or Congenital Disorders To A Qualified Specialist For Follow-up Services, Including Treatment, Counseling, And Education.
Title
Neonatal testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2022-03-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-03-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |