SC S0992 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognize The South Carolina Ports Authority's Port Ambassador Program And To Honor The 2017-2018 Program Participants.
Title
SC Ports Ambassador Program Participants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | Amended |
2018-02-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, sent to House |